Cheung, Matthew Chat-To (CPSO#: 74010)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room T2 031
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4928
Fax: (416) 480-6002
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Cheung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 16 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Cheung ( CPSO# 74010 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room T2 031
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4928

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 21 Sep 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MATTHEW CHAT-TO CHEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 28 Feb 2007
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003