Cheung, Michael Ming Hon (CPSO#: 77268)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 27 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 Jul 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Bristol, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2004
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Jul 2005