Cheung, Roderick Ting Fung (CPSO#: 90774)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Feb 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 7
105 Progress Crescent
Kapuskasing ON  P5N 3J4
Phone: (705) 335-2051
Fax: (705) 337-5266
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Roderick Cheung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Cheung ( CPSO# 90774 )

Business Address:
Suite 7
105 Progress Crescent
Kapuskasing ON  P5N 3J4
Phone Number: (705) 335-2051

Business Address:
101 Progress Crescent
Kapuskasing ON  P5N 3H5
Phone Number: (705) 337-6111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Notre-Dame Hospital Hearst
Sensenbrenner Hospital Kapuskasing

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Dec 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RODERICK TING FUNG CHEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 2012