Cheung, Thomas (CPSO#: 95457)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Feb 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1 Hospital Ct
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

47 Liberty St S
Bowmanville ON  L1C 2N4
Canada
Phone: (905) 623-3331
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Thomas Cheung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 26 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Cheung ( CPSO# 95457 )

Business Address:
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jul 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THOMAS CHEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 2014