Chhabra, Mehtaab Kaur (CPSO#: 96005)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: Uppal, Mehtaab Kaur (used until: 22 Jun 2016 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone: 5194644400 Ext. 5304
Fax: 5194644516
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.K. Chhabra Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 12 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Chhabra ( CPSO# 96005 )

Business Address:
Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone Number: (519) 464-4400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MEHTAAB KAUR CHHABRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHHABRA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 24 Oct 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 25 Oct 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016