Chia, Shea Tzi (CPSO#: 74729)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 207
531 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 6P5
Phone: (905) 953-8838
Fax: (905) 953-8521
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shea Chia Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 03 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chia ( CPSO# 74729 )

Business Address:
Suite 207
531 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 6P5
Phone Number: (905) 953-8838

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHEA TZI CHIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHIA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2005