Chiasson, Darrell Edward (CPSO#: 85563)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 09 Aug 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Dalhousie University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Chiasson and Goth Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 20 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 12 Oct 2011 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2006
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Aug 2013