Chiavaras, Mary Margaret (CPSO#: 78170)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Massachusetts, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton General Hospital
Diagnostic Imaging
237 Barton St. E
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 527-4322 Ext. 46521
Fax: (905) 527-5761
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

David Braley Sport Medicine &
Rehabilitation Centre
McMaster University DBAC WB127
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S4K1
Canada
Phone: 9055259140 Ext. 23575
Fax: 9055267397
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Wentworth Halton X-Ray & Ultrasound
1 Young Street
Hamilton ON  L8N 1T8
Canada
Phone: 905-572-6868
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chiavaras Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 18 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Sahlas ( CPSO# 76855 )
Dr. M. Chiavaras ( CPSO# 78170 )

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital
Diagnostic Imaging
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 527-4322

Business Address:
DBAC McMaster University
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 525-9140

Business Address:
Wentworth Halton X-ray and Ultrasound
105 - 1 Younge Street
Hamilton ON  L8N 1T8

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 17 May 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARY MARGARET CHIAVARAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHIAVARAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Nov 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Dec 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2010