Chiella, Antonietta Anna (CPSO#: 74700)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medical Associates of Port Perry
462 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Phone: (905) 985-2895 Ext. 5420
Fax: (844) 840-3226
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adams Gilmour Smith Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 13 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Nguyen ( CPSO# 88893 )
Dr. A. Gauster ( CPSO# 100273)
Dr. B. Tse ( CPSO# 91489 )
Dr. D. Wang ( CPSO# 90666 )
Dr. S. Cull ( CPSO# 82751 )
Dr. A. Armstrong ( CPSO# 84261 )
Dr. J. Tuck ( CPSO# 64782 )
Dr. T. Stryde ( CPSO# 73931 )
Dr. J. Stewart ( CPSO# 25659 )
Dr. M. Stewart ( CPSO# 62187 )
Dr. K. Smith ( CPSO# 66319 )
Dr. S. Shepherd ( CPSO# 71354 )
Dr. E. Russell ( CPSO# 59302 )
Dr. S. Russell ( CPSO# 60638 )
Dr. P. Puckrin ( CPSO# 27488 )
Dr. A. Pawley ( CPSO# 87461 )
Dr. F. Nasser-Sharif ( CPSO# 72700 )
Dr. G. Mercer ( CPSO# 60472 )
Dr. N. Kazarian ( CPSO# 71482 )
Dr. S. Hyshka ( CPSO# 67972 )
Dr. M. Gilmour ( CPSO# 59725 )
Dr. K. Ferguson ( CPSO# 76506 )
Dr. A. Dayal ( CPSO# 79055 )
Dr. R. Adams ( CPSO# 72364 )
Dr. F. Ali ( CPSO# 76181 )
Dr. R. Allin ( CPSO# 20746 )
Dr. K. Best ( CPSO# 75245 )
Dr. A. Brown ( CPSO# 59455 )
Dr. M. Brown ( CPSO# 69023 )
Dr. A. Chiella ( CPSO# 74700 )
Dr. M. Schurter ( CPSO# 82718 )
Dr. R. Wray ( CPSO# 86630 )
Dr. J. Ross ( CPSO# 88724 )
Dr. C. Westbrook ( CPSO# 89258 )
Dr. C. Hadden ( CPSO# 100522)

Business Address:
Medical Associates of Port Perry
462 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Phone Number: (905) 985-2895


Corporation Name: Dr. A. Chiella Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 22 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Chiella ( CPSO# 74700 )

Business Address:
Medical Associates of Port Perry
462 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Phone Number: (905) 985-2895

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site Port Perry

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANTONIETTA ANNA CHIELLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHIELLA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Oct 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2001 to 30 Apr 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 May 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2003