Child, Jeremy Raleigh (CPSO#: 72382)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Aug 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Tremont Medical Clinic
2A-2F Tremont Drive
St Catharines ON  L2T 3B2
Phone: (905) 687-8887
Fax: (905) 641-3693
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jeremy Child, Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 15 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Child ( CPSO# 72382 )

Business Address:
2A-2F Tremont Drive
St Catharines ON  L2T 3B2
Phone Number: (905) 688-8887

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEREMY RALEIGH CHILD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHILD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 21 Aug 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2000
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 14 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2009