Chin, Ami Jun-Yee (CPSO#: 91479)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Aug 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bruyere Hospital
Dept. of Care of the Elderly
43 Bruyere Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 5C8
Phone: (613) 562-6262
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ami Chin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 16 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Chin ( CPSO# 91479 )

Business Address:
Bruyere Family Medicine Centre
43 Bruyere Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 5C8
Phone Number: (613) 562-6262

Business Address:
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-Elisabeth Bruyere Site Ottawa
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 07 Jul 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMI JUN-YEE CHIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2012