Chin, Ashley (CPSO#: 93640)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Sep 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Cape Town, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 26 Aug 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

McMaster University, 27 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Sep 2012
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2012