Chin, Esther Anne (CPSO#: 93519)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Niagara Health System
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Electoral District: 04

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia
Zimbabwe

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 25 May 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ESTHER ANNE CHIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 06 Apr 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 07 Apr 2015 to 18 May 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 19 May 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 02 May 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 May 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 2016