Chin, Ian Douglas (CPSO#: 66586)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jul 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1300 Keith Ross Drive
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Phone: (905) 721-4910
Fax: (905) 721-6672
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

117 King Street East
Oshawa ON  L1H 1B9
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ian D. Chin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 22 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Chin ( CPSO# 66586 )

Business Address:
1300 Keith Ross Drive
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Phone Number: (905) 721-4910

Business Address:
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IAN DOUGLAS CHIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1999