Chin, Lisa Ann-Marie (CPSO#: 97404)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Apr 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Apr 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of the West Indies, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 05 Apr 2012 to 18 Apr 2012
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 19 Apr 2012 to 30 Apr 2012
Elective Trainee - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Apr 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Apr 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2012