Chin, Stephen Chiu Hon (CPSO#: 84410)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jan 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jan 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial
Hospital
Halton Healthcare
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone: (905) 845-2571
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter Man Cho Chin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 09 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chin ( CPSO# 84410 )
Dr. P. Chin ( CPSO# 31149 )

Business Address:
Suite 212
6855 Meadowvale Town Centre
Mississauga ON  L5N 2Y1
Phone Number: (905) 821-1211


Corporation Name: Dr. Stephen Chin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 04 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chin ( CPSO# 84410 )

Business Address:
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Dec 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHEN CHIU HON CHIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Jan 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2009