Chingkoe, Christina Marie (CPSO#: 93810)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Feb 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Feb 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1815 Ironstone Manor, Suite 15B
Pickering ON  L1W 3W9
Phone: 905-831-1800
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Scarborough Rouge Hospital
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Canada
Phone: 416-284-8131
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Lakeridge Health
Ajax and Pickering
580 Harwood Ave S
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Canada
Phone: (905) 683-2320
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
100 Frank Miller Dr
Huntsville ON  P1H 1H7
Canada
Phone: (705) 789-2311
County: District Municipality of Muskoka
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christina Chingkoe Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 19 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Chingkoe ( CPSO# 93810 )

Business Address:
Ellesmere x-Ray Associates
1815 Ironstone Manor
Suite 15B
Pickering ON  L1W 3W9

Business Address:
2867 Ellesmere Road
Pickering ON  M1E 4B9

Business Address:
580 Harwood Avenue
Ajax ON  L1S 2S4

Business Address:
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Muskoka Algonquin Health Care,South Muskoka Memorial Site Bracebridge
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto
West Parry Sound Health Centre Parry Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTINA MARIE CHINGKOE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHINGKOE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Feb 2016