Chirayilkalam, Shereen Brajit (CPSO#: 81645)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Malayalam, Tamil, Urdu

Education:University of Kerala, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
153 Perry Street
Whitby ON  L1N 4B7
Phone: (905) 666-0500
Fax: (905) 666-0400
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shereen Chirayilkalam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 28 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chirayilkalam ( CPSO# 81645 )

Business Address:
153 Perry Street
Whitby ON  L1N 4B7
Phone Number: (905) 666-0500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 20 May 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHEREEN BRAJIT CHIRAYILKALAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHIRAYILKALAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 07 Jul 2004 to 22 Sep 2004
Assessment Verification Period - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2009