Chiu, Edward Samson (CPSO#: 91488)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1110 Sheppard Ave East
Suite 306
Toronto ON  M2K 2W2
Phone: (416) 491-8306
Fax: (416) 491-8308
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

North York Family Physicians
After Hours Clinic
2901 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M2K 2Y6
Canada
Phone: (416) 491-6338
Fax: (416) 491-6428
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chiu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 08 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Chiu ( CPSO# 91488 )

Business Address:
1110 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 306
Toronto ON  M2K 2W2
Phone Number: (416) 491-8306

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EDWARD SAMSON CHIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHIU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011