Chiu, Hannah Hiu-Yan (CPSO#: 95738)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 801
61 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone: (416) 867-7422
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 401
7900 Hurontario Street
Brampton ON  L6Y 0P6
Canada
Phone: (416) 292-0330
Fax: (416) 292-0331
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Suite 221
2180 Steeles Ave West
Vaughan ON  L4K 2Z5
Canada
Phone: 416-292-0330
Fax: 416-292-0331
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Hannah H. Chiu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 19 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Chiu ( CPSO# 95738 )

Business Address:
801 - 61 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone Number: (416) 867-3704

Business Address:
401 - 7900 Hurontario Street
Brampton ON  L6Y 0P6
Phone Number: (416) 292-0330

Business Address:
221 - 2180 Steeles Avenue West
Concord ON  L4K 2Z5
Phone Number: (416) 292-0330

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HANNAH HIU-YAN CHIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHIU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016