Cho, Romy (CPSO#: 95739)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6275
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

McMaster Children's Hospital
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Canada
Phone: (905) 521-2100
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROMY CHO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Mar 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Mar 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Jun 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016