Chochinov, Erin Michelle (CPSO#: 70256)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Dec 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Science Centre
Department of Aneasthesia
Sunnybrook Site M3-200
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4864
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Holland orthopedic and Arthritic
Hospital, Dept of Anesthesia
40 Wellesley St, Toronto
Toronto ON  M4Y 1G4
Canada
Phone: (416) 967-8500
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Kensington Cancer Screening Clinic
340 College st, Toronto
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michelle Chochinov Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 27 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Chochinov ( CPSO# 70256 )

Business Address:
Holland Orthopaedic Hospital
43 Wellesley Street East
Toronto ON  M4Y 1H1
Phone Number: (416) 967-8500

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
Suite M3-200
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4864

Business Address:
Kensington Screening Clinic
Unit 601
340 College Street
Maberly ON  M5T 3A9
Phone Number: (416) 928-9511

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre,Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERIN MICHELLE CHOCHINOV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOCHINOV is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2001