Chodirker, Lisa (CPSO#: 79031)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Odette Cancer Centre
Sunnybrook health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-5847
Fax: (416) 480-6002
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mark Osten Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 14 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Osten ( CPSO# 75254 )
Dr. L. Chodirker ( CPSO# 79031 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
6EN-Rm 232B
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4615


Corporation Name: Lisa Chodirker Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 03 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Osten ( CPSO# 75254 )
Dr. L. Chodirker ( CPSO# 79031 )

Business Address:
University Health Network
Toronto General Hospital
Peter Munk Cardiac Centre
6th Floor Room 238
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4615

Business Address:
Odette Cancer Centre
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
T2 - 039
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-5847

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 16 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LISA CHODIRKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHODIRKER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 01 Jan 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 09 Mar 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 28 Feb 2010
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007