Choi, Mark (CPSO#: 92520)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 07 Apr 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Apr 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 22 Feb 2010 to 12 Mar 2010
Elective Trainee - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 22 Oct 2012 to 07 Apr 2013
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Feb 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Mar 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Dec 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Apr 2013