Choi, Matthew (CPSO#: 89022)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Oct 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Oct 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster Childrens Hospital
Department of Pediatric Surgery
Room 4E
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: 905-521-2100 Ext. 73550
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Matthew Choi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 21 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mullins ( CPSO# 92755 )
Dr. M. Choi ( CPSO# 89022 )

Business Address:
McMaster Children's Hospital
Department of Pediatric Surgery
Room 4E
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155


Corporation Name: Dr. Melanie Mullins Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 13 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mullins ( CPSO# 92755 )
Dr. M. Choi ( CPSO# 89022 )

Business Address:
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Business Address:
202-5359 Dundas Street West
Etobicoke ON  M9B 1B1
Phone Number: (416) 622-3266

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MATTHEW CHOI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Sep 2008
Elective Trainee - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 2011