Choi, Monica Arrina (CPSO#: 86940)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Aug 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
250 College St
Toronto ON  M5T 1R8
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 34016
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1619 Queen St E
Toronto ON  M4L 1G4
Canada
Phone: 417-778-5858
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Monica A. Choi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 30 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Choi ( CPSO# 86940 )

Business Address:
250 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Business Address:
Suite 801
30 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5R 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Business Address:
1619 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M4L 1G4
Phone Number: (416) 778-5858

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MONICA ARRINA CHOI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2012