Choi, Young Suk (CPSO#: 64172)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Sep 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2075 Hadwen Road
Mississauga ON  L5K 2L3
Phone: (905) 855-1860 Ext. 231
Fax: (905) 855-1863
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Young S. Choi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 27 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Choi ( CPSO# 64172 )

Business Address:
2075 Hadwen Road
Mississauga ON  L5K 2L3
Phone Number: (905) 855-1320

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YOUNG SUK CHOI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 1992