Chong, David Lap Tung (CPSO#: 76494)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 17 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jul 2009