Choo, Ren Ee (CPSO#: 103274)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
37 The Links Rd
North York ON  M2P 1T7
Phone: 416-730-1212
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1188 Danforth Ave
Toronto ON  M4J 1M3
Canada
Phone: 4167786777
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

202-6212 Main Street
Stouffville ON  L4A 2S5
Canada
Phone: 9055914969
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

1901 Yonge St, unit 4
Toronto ON  M4S 1Y6
Canada
Phone: 416-483-0102
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. REN EE CHOO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 23 Aug 2016 to 09 Jan 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2016