Choppa, Sailaja (CPSO#: 76635)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Aug 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jul 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Telugu

Education:Sri Venkatesvara University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 138
2462 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 3V6
Phone: (519) 971-2726
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Walk In
Suite 103
2462 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 3V6
Canada
Phone: (519) 258-5696
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

5881 Malden Road
Rexall Clinic
La Salle ON  N8H1S5
Canada
Phone: 5199663411
Fax: 5192508884
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sailaja Choppa Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 03 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Choppa ( CPSO# 76635 )

Business Address:
138 - 2462 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 3V6
Phone Number: (519) 971-2726

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jul 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAILAJA CHOPPA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOPPA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2001 to 31 Jul 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2002 to 31 Jul 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2003