Chopra, Justin Amitoj (CPSO#: 92865)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Site
Division of Palliative Care
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone: 905-848-7557
Fax: 905-848-7419
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Justin Amitoj Chopra Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 21 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Chopra ( CPSO# 92865 )

Business Address:
Trillium Health Partners
Division of Palliative Care
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (647) 937-4623

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JUSTIN AMITOJ CHOPRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOPRA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Palliative Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012