Chopra, Meera (CPSO#: 88684)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
18-1910 St Laurent Blvd
Ottawa ON  K1G 1A4
Phone: (613) 523-5550
Fax: (613) 521-9083
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Meera Chopra Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 01 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Chopra ( CPSO# 88684 )

Business Address:
18-1910 Laurent Boulevard
Ottawa ON  K1G 1A4
Phone Number: (613) 523-5550

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MEERA CHOPRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOPRA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2010