Chorny, Yelena Joelle (CPSO#: 93977)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jan 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Addiction Medicine Service
Homewood Health Centre
150 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 6K9
Phone: (519) 824-1010
Fax: (519) 767-3567
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Rapid Access Addiction Clinic
Suite #2, 176 Wyndham Street North
Guelph ON  N1H 8N9
Canada
Phone: 1-844-722-2977
Fax: 519-821-5834
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Yelena Chorny Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 20 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Chorny ( CPSO# 93977 )

Business Address:
Addiction Medicine Service
Homewood Health Centre
150 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 6K9
Phone Number: (519) 824-1010

Business Address:
Rapid Access Clinic
Guelph Community Health Centre
Suite 2
176 Wyndham Street North
Guelph ON  N1H 8N9
Phone Number: (844) 437-3247

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Homewood Health Centre Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Dec 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YELENA JOELLE CHORNY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHORNY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 2013