Choudhry, Ashwani (CPSO#: 73148)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Nov 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Nov 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:L L R M Medical College, Meerut Univ, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 205
3530 Derry Road East
Mississauga ON  L4T 4E3
Phone: (905) 676-0006
Fax: (905) 676-9992
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Unit 30,
2130 North Park Drive
Brampton ON  L6S 0C9
Canada
Phone: (905) 595-5505
Fax: (905) 595-5506
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Suite 309
2100 Finch Avenue
North York ON  M3N 2Z9
Canada
Phone: (416) 665-6336
Fax: (416) 665-8319
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ashwani Choudhry Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 25 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Choudhry ( CPSO# 73148 )

Business Address:
309 - 2100 Finch Avenue West
North York ON  M3N 2Z9
Phone Number: (416) 665-6336

Business Address:
Suite 30
2130 North Park Drive
Brampton ON  L6S 0C9
Phone Number: (905) 595-5505

Business Address:
205 - 3530 Derry Road East
Mississauga ON  L4T 4E3
Phone Number: (905) 676-0006

Business Address:
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Department of Cardiology
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 23 Nov 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ASHWANI CHOUDHRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOUDHRY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 1998