Chouinard, Erin Leanne Dawn (CPSO#: 95474)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Names: Graham, Erin Leanne Dawn (used until: 09 Sep 2012 )     Michel, Erin Leanne Dawn (used until: 09 Sep 2012 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Northeast Family Medicine Centre
3557 Errington Avenue
Chelmsford ON  P0M 1L0
Phone: (705) 590-2550
Fax: (705) 590-2570
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Erin L. D. Chouinard Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 13 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Chouinard ( CPSO# 95474 )

Business Address:
3557 Errington Avenue
Chelmsford ON  P0M 1L0
Phone Number: (705) 590-2550

Business Address:
80 Elm Street
Sudbury ON  P3C 1T2
Phone Number: (705) 806-7915

Business Address:
93 Notre Dame Street West
Azilda ON  P0M 1B0
Phone Number: (705) 522-3380

Business Address:
1280 Lasalle Boulevard
Sudbury ON  P3A 1Y8
Phone Number: (705) 522-3380

Business Address:
2009 Long Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3B 6C3
Phone Number: (705) 522-3380

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERIN LEANNE DAWN CHOUINARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOUINARD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2013