Chow, David Robert (CPSO#: 62433)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Aug 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Aug 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 8-125
61 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5T 2C2
Phone: (416) 867-7447
Fax: (416) 867-7445
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto Retina Institute
Suite 208
6 Maginn Mews
North York ON  M3C 0G9
Canada
Phone: (416) 449-3937
Fax: (416) 449-0874
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Clarity Eye
Unit 300 Plaza II
350 Rutherford Road South
Brampton ON  L6W 4N6
Canada
Phone: (416) 663-3937
Fax: (416) 663-3731
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Chow Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 12 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Chow ( CPSO# 62433 )

Business Address:
Sutie 125
8th Floor
61 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5T 2C2
Phone Number: (416) 867-7447

Business Address:
Toronto Retina Institute
208 - 6 Maginn Mews
Toronto ON  M3C 0G9
Phone Number: (416) 449-3937

Business Address:
Clarity Eye
350 Rutherford Road South
300 Plaza 2
Brampton ON  L6W 4N6
Phone Number: (416) 663-3937


Corporation Name: Dr. David Chow and Dr. Alan Berger Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 11 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Berger ( CPSO# 52456 )
Dr. D. Chow ( CPSO# 62433 )

Business Address:
Suite 801
61 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5T 2C2
Phone Number: (416) 867-3663


Corporation Name: Chow Berger Koushan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 06 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Berger ( CPSO# 52456 )
Dr. D. Chow ( CPSO# 62433 )
Dr. K. Koushan ( CPSO# 86788 )

Business Address:
Toronto Retina Institute
Suite 208
6 Maginn Mews
Toronto ON  M3C 0G9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kensington Eye Institute Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID ROBERT CHOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOW is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1991
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 13 Dec 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2005