Chow, Elaine Stephanie (CPSO#: 95991)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 29 Feb 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Mar 2012 to 30 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 31 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Jul 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2018