Chow, Jacqueline Wing-Mun (CPSO#: 95092)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Jul 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: White's Medical Clinic 727 Jane Street York ON M6N 4B3 Canada
Date Received: 28 Jul 2017

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2014 to 31 Mar 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Jul 2017