Chow, Lorraine (CPSO#: 84137)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jan 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jan 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
C222
1403 29 Street Northwest
Calgary AB  T2N 2T9
Phone: (403) 944-1430

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LORRAINE CHOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOW is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 10 Apr 2006 to 07 May 2006
Elective Trainee - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 08 May 2006 to 09 Jun 2006
Elective Trainee - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 06 Apr 2009 to 03 May 2009
Elective Trainee - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 27 Jul 2009 to 23 Aug 2009
Elective Trainee - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jul 2014
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 May 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 2014