Chow, Peter Ming (CPSO#: 65192)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Georgetown Hospital
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 2B8
Phone: (905) 873-0111 Ext. x8232
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

710 Dorval Drive, Suite 202
Oakville ON  L6K 3V7
Canada
Phone: (905) 607-0022
Fax: (905) 607-0013
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

470 Chrysler Drive, Units 11-15
Brampton ON  L6S 6C1
Canada
Phone: (905) 790-9030
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

2227 South Millway
Suite #303
Mississauga ON  L5L 3R6
Canada
Phone: (905) 569-7007
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

1144 Wilson Street
Ancaster ON  L9G 3K9
Canada
Phone: (905) 304-0062
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

2225 Erin Mills Parkway, Unit 183
Mississauga ON  L5K 1T9
Canada
Phone: (905) 823-0223
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

1960 Appleby Line
Burlington ON  L7L0B7
Canada
Phone: 905-335-1888
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

10886 Hurontario Street, Suite A-7
Brampton ON  L7A3R9
Canada
Phone: 905-495-5200
Fax: 905-495-5210
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

10 Cottrelle Blvd, Unit 207
Brampton ON  L6S 0E2
Canada
Phone: 905-794-4497
Fax: 905-794-7258
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Peter Chow Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 05 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Chow ( CPSO# 65192 )

Business Address:
Halton Health Care Services
Georgetown Hospital
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 2B8
Phone Number: (905) 873-0111

Business Address:
7-10 - 3095 Glen Erin Drive
Mississauga ON  L5L 1J3

Business Address:
202 - 710 Dorval Drive
Oakville ON  L6K 3V7

Business Address:
Suite 11 - 15
470 Chrysler Drive
Brampton ON  L6S 0C1
Phone Number: (905) 790-9030

Business Address:
303 - 2227 South Millway
Mississauga ON  L5L 3R6
Phone Number: (905) 569-7007

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER MING CHOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOW is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1993