Chow, Signy (CPSO#: 89260)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Feb 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Feb 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room T2018
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4928
Fax: (416) 480-6002
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 07 May 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 31 Dec 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SIGNY CHOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOW is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 18 Feb 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Sep 2014
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Dec 2017
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Feb 2014