Chow, Tiffany WingChoy (CPSO#: 78892)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 27 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Rush Medical College, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Baycrest Health Records 3560 Bathurst Street Toronto, ON M6A 2E1
Date Received: 27 Jul 2015

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Mar 2003
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Mar 2003
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 Mar 2004
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Sep 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Mar 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Mar 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Jul 2015