Chowdhury, Bikash Kanti (CPSO#: 94062)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Feb 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Feb 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English

Education:University of Chittagong, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Tillsonburg Medical Centre
200 Broadway
Tillsonburg ON  N4G 5A7
Phone: (519) 842-4231
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Tillsonburg Medical Centre
200 Broadway Street
Tillsonburg ON  M4G 4A7
Canada
Phone: (519) 842-3611
County: County of Oxford
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bikash Chowdhury Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 13 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Chowdhury ( CPSO# 94062 )

Business Address:
Tillsonburg Medical Centre
200 Broadway Street
Tillsonburg ON  N4G 5A7

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Dec 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BIKASH KANTI CHOWDHURY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOWDHURY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 23 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Nov 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Feb 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Feb 2013