Christakis, Marie Katherine (CPSO#: 97690)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Nov 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Nov 2017

Summary

Former Name: Coroneos, Marie Katherine (used until: 02 Aug 2016 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
15-018B Cardinal Carter
30 Bond St
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: 416-867-7480
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Panos G. Christakis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 15 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Christakis ( CPSO# 97690 )
Dr. P. Christakis ( CPSO# 98220 )

Business Address:
Kensington Eye Institute
340 College Street
Suite 501
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Phone Number: (416) 928-1335

Business Address:
6E - 423
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5444

Business Address:
Suite 200
245 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4K 1N2
Phone Number: (416) 462-0393

Business Address:
Floor 2
61 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone Number: (416) 867-7480

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
15 - 018B Cardinal Carter
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 867-7480

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIE KATHERINE CHRISTAKIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHRISTAKIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 2017