Christakis, Theodore Jonathan (CPSO#: 93978)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
245 Danforth Avenue
Suite 200
Toronto ON  M4K 1N2
Phone: (416) 462-0393
Fax: (416) 462-3612
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

20 Wynford Drive
Suite 305
Toronto ON  M3C 1J4
Canada
Phone: (416) 441-1313
Fax: (416) 441-6138
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Theodore J. Christakis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 29 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Christakis ( CPSO# 93978 )
Dr. A. Carleton ( CPSO# 104038)

Business Address:
245 Danforth Avenue
Suite 200
Toronto ON  M4K 1N2
Phone Number: (416) 462-0393

Business Address:
20 Wynford Drive
Suite 305
Toronto ON  M3C 1J4
Phone Number: (416) 441-1313

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THEODORE JONATHAN CHRISTAKIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHRISTAKIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015