Christjanson, Lisa Jennifer (CPSO#: 74922)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Sep 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Sep 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cancer Clinic
Joseph Brant Hospital
1245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington ON  L7S 0A2
Phone: (905) 336-4103
Fax: (905) 336-6492
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. L Christjanson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 20 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Christjanson ( CPSO# 74922 )

Business Address:
Joseph Brant Hospital
Cancer Clinic
1245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington ON  L7S 0A2
Phone Number: (905) 632-3730

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 20 Sep 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LISA JENNIFER CHRISTJANSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHRISTJANSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2002 to 30 Apr 2002
Elective Trainee - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2005