Chu, Eric Kuo-Chi (CPSO#: 72295)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Pinnacle Health Sciences Center
9651 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 1V7
Phone: 905-780-8823
Fax: 905-780-8821
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital
10 Trench street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 1V7
Canada
Phone: (905) 883-1212
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E.K. Chu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 21 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Chu ( CPSO# 72295 )

Business Address:
York Central Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 780-8823

Business Address:
9651 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 1V7
Phone Number: (905) 780-8823

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 14 Sep 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERIC KUO-CHI CHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2004