Chu, Gordon Kwok Tung (CPSO#: 77173)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Nov 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Nov 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. John's Hospital
421 North Ninth Street
Springfield IL  62701
United States
Phone: (217) 757-6868
Fax: (217) 757-6867

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Illinois

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GORDON KWOK TUNG CHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Nov 2007
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2001