Chu, Jacqueline Chia Ling (CPSO#: 80706)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:McMaster University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2510 Hampshire Gate, Unit 2
Oakville ON  L6H 6A2
Phone: (905) 901-1882
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

10260 Kennedy Road North
Brampton ON  L6Z 4N7
Canada
Phone: (905) 495-4695
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wong-Chu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 22 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Wong ( CPSO# 80708 )
Dr. J. Chu ( CPSO# 80706 )

Business Address:
Halton Healthcare Services
Milton District Hospital
725 Bronte Street South
Milton ON  L9T 9K1
Phone Number: (905) 878-2383

Business Address:
2 - 2510 Hampshire Gate
Oakville ON  L6H 6A2
Phone Number: (905) 901-1882

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JACQUELINE CHIA LING CHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009