Chu, Michael Wayne Art (CPSO#: 75592)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Nov 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Nov 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC University Hospital
Room B6-106
P O Box 5339
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3593
Fax: (519) 663-3595
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chu and Van Hooren Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Van Hooren ( CPSO# 82642 )
Dr. M. Chu ( CPSO# 75592 )

Business Address:
B1-132C
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
LHSC - University Campus
Division of Cardiac Surgery
Room B6-106 - 339 Windermere Road
P.O. Box 5339
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3593

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre South Street Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiac Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL WAYNE ART CHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Aug 2000 to 14 Aug 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiac Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Aug 2001 to 14 Aug 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiac Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Aug 2002 to 14 Aug 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Aug 2003 to 14 Aug 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Aug 2004 to 14 Aug 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Aug 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Nov 2007